Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
900 |
m/e |
03/1930 |
British Railways |
30900 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
ETON |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/02/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1930 |
STL |
|
St Leonards |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
74E |
St Leonards |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
06/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1947 |
St Leonards MPD |
Locos. under or awaiting repair here on 21st November last included 'V' 900/6, 'C1' C28 TON, 'N1' 1877, '01' 1432, 'El' tank 2129 TON ex loan to Gypsum Mines. |
SLS/194801 |
31/05/1948 |
Brighton Works |
Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. |
SLS/194807 |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 900 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30900 |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30900 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|