Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1436 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19239 Week
» 72255 Month
» 191782 Year
» 3218635 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
861 |
m/e |
09/1929 |
British Railways |
30861 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Lord Nelson |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1942 |
Southern Notes |
On 19/12, the 2.20 p.m. ex Bournemouth West consisted of 14 coaches; heavily loaded, tare weight 445 tons, with 861 Lord Anson; the 28¾ miles Bournemouth Central to Southampton Central were covered in 36 minutes, a gain on schedule of 2 mins. On the same date, the Plymouth-Brighton through train left Southampton with 14 vehicles, the engines being 727 (pilot) and 470 (train). |
SLS/194302 |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 861 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30861 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30861 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|