Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
860 |
m/e |
04/1929 |
British Railways |
30860 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Lord Nelson |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 04/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/08/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1929 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71B |
|
Bournemouth |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
26/11/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
11/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
8w/e |
06/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
P |
26/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 860 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30860 |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30860 |
|
|