Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 994 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18797 Week
» 71813 Month
» 191340 Year
» 3218193 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
852 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
30852 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Lord Nelson |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 07/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/02/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1928 |
BM |
|
Bournemouth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 852 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30852 |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30852 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|