Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1855 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15261 Week
» 68277 Month
» 187804 Year
» 3214657 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
798 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
British Railways |
30798 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/06/1962 |
Service Life |
36 yrs , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 798, name: SIR HECTIMERE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30798 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30798 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|