Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3962 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17368 Week
» 70384 Month
» 189911 Year
» 3216764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
794 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
30794 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/08/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 794, name: SIR ECTOR DE MARIS Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30794 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
20/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30794 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|