Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14159 Week
» 67175 Month
» 186702 Year
» 3213555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
788 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
30788 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. |
SLS/196004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 788, name: SIR URRE OF THE MOUNT Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30788 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30788 |
|
|