Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18156 Week
» 71172 Month
» 190699 Year
» 3217552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
784 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
British Railways |
30784 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 784, name: SIR NEROVENS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30784 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30784 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|