Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 428 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18231 Week
» 71247 Month
» 190774 Year
» 3217627 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
783 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
British Railways |
30783 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (Waiting works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 783, name: SIR GILLEMERE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30783 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30783 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|