Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2464 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15870 Week
» 68886 Month
» 188413 Year
» 3215266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
779 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
British Railways |
30779 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1948 |
Eastleigh Works |
Further locomotives ex Works painted malachite green and lined include Nos. 30779, 30805, 30913/37, while those painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30901/31. New 'Merchant Navy' Class Nos. 35021-22 are painted malachite green, but were not lined when first seen; No. 35023, which was on steam trials on 5/11, was malachite green and lined. Frames are set up for the ex L.M.S. type 2-6-4T's, which are to be built here. Locomotives awaiting Works on 5/11 included:-Nos. 902/09/10/35 and Beattie 2-4-OWT No. 3314. The only 'IlX' Class remaining at Eastleigh are Nos. 2004 an 2598, while those of the class which have been condemned are being broken up at Dinton. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 779, name: SIR COLGREVANCE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30779 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30779 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|