Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16824 Week
» 69840 Month
» 189367 Year
» 3216220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
774 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
30774 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/03/1955 |
Easter Holiday arrangements |
Passenger engines, other than 30736, 30774, 31787, 34087 an 34101, will be withdrawn from store as required for Easter Holiday special traffic and returned to store afterwards. |
SLS/195504 |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (on 'dump') |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 774, name: SIR GAHERIS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30774 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
07/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30774 |
|
|