Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
771 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
30771 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 771, name: SIR SAGRAMORE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30771 |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
24/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30771 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|