Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 794 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 794 Week
» 54248 Month
» 400672 Year
» 3427525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
766 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
British Railways |
30766 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1925 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BAT |
|
Stewarts Lane |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 766, name: SIR GERAINT Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30766 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30766 |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|