Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 984 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15027 Week
» 79981 Month
» 282645 Year
» 3309498 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
753 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
British Railways |
30753 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
01/1923 |
MELISANDE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 01/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/03/1957 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 753, name: MELISANDE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30753 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
30/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
03/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30753 |
|
|