Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4199 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17605 Week
» 70621 Month
» 190148 Year
» 3217001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
741 |
m/e |
05/1919 |
British Railways |
30741 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 05/1919 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/02/1956 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1919 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BAS |
|
Basingstoke |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/02/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 741, name: JOYOUS GARD Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30741 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/02/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30741 |
|
|