Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 89 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17892 Week
» 70908 Month
» 190435 Year
» 3217288 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
736 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
British Railways |
30736 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1918 |
EXCALIBUR |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1918 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1956 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/03/1955 |
Easter Holiday arrangements |
Passenger engines, other than 30736, 30774, 31787, 34087 an 34101, will be withdrawn from store as required for Easter Holiday special traffic and returned to store afterwards. |
SLS/195504 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 736, name: EXCALIBUR Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30736 |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30736 |
|
|