Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3073 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16479 Week
» 69495 Month
» 189022 Year
» 3215875 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
727 |
m/e |
10/1899 |
British Railways |
30727 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 10/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1942 |
Southern Notes |
On 19/12, the 2.20 p.m. ex Bournemouth West consisted of 14 coaches; heavily loaded, tare weight 445 tons, with 861 Lord Anson; the 28¾ miles Bournemouth Central to Southampton Central were covered in 36 minutes, a gain on schedule of 2 mins. On the same date, the Plymouth-Brighton through train left Southampton with 14 vehicles, the engines being 727 (pilot) and 470 (train). |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 727 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30727 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30727 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|