Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 382 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21416 Week
» 120061 Month
» 322725 Year
» 3349578 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
704 |
m/e |
01/1899 |
British Railways |
30704 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/10/1951 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 704 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30704 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30704 |
|
|