Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
700 |
m/e |
05/1897 |
British Railways |
30700 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
15/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
8w/e |
20/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
q/e |
12/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 700 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30700 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
10/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30700 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|