Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1067 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18870 Week
» 71886 Month
» 191413 Year
» 3218266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
690 |
m/e |
03/1897 |
British Railways |
30690 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 03/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1897 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71B |
|
Bournemouth |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
70C |
|
Guildford |
8w/e |
17/01/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
31/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
8w/e |
17/01/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (awaiting scrap) |
Eastleigh shed contained the following locomotives awaiting scrap: 4656, 30033/45/65/70, 30199/225/494/502/17, 30690, 30770, 30917/26/9/37, 30955, 31892, 32346/9/50/1, 32408. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 690 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30690 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
17/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30690 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|