Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16990 Week
» 70006 Month
» 189533 Year
» 3216386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3314 |
m/e |
05/1874 |
British Railways |
30585 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Beattie |
Class |
Well Tank |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
2-4-0WT |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 05/1874 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
88 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1874 |
WAD |
|
Wadebridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
72F |
Wadebridge |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
REINS |
72F |
Wadebridge |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1948 |
Eastleigh Works |
Further locomotives ex Works painted malachite green and lined include Nos. 30779, 30805, 30913/37, while those painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30901/31. New 'Merchant Navy' Class Nos. 35021-22 are painted malachite green, but were not lined when first seen; No. 35023, which was on steam trials on 5/11, was malachite green and lined. Frames are set up for the ex L.M.S. type 2-6-4T's, which are to be built here. Locomotives awaiting Works on 5/11 included:-Nos. 902/09/10/35 and Beattie 2-4-OWT No. 3314. The only 'IlX' Class remaining at Eastleigh are Nos. 2004 an 2598, while those of the class which have been condemned are being broken up at Dinton. |
SLS/194812 |
30/06/1962 |
Southern Miscellany |
During April and May, Collett 1366 Class 0-6-0PT loco. 1368 of Weymouth (71G) was working from Wadebridge (72F) on the Wenford Bridge line, as a possible successor to the veteran Beattie ex-L.S.W.R. 0298 Class 2-4-OWT locos. 30585-7. We understand that if these trials are satisfactory, 1368 will be joined by 1367 an 1369. |
SLS/196207 |
31/07/1962 |
Beattie Well Tanks for Preservation? |
We are informed that all three Beattie ex-L.S.W.R. 0298 Class 2-4-0WT locos are scheduled for preservation upon withdrawal, as follows : 30585 to the Bluebell Railway, 30586 to a private purchaser (details not yet available) and 30587 to the B.T.C. Collection. |
SLS/196210 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1874 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3314 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wadebridge (WAD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30585 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30585 |
|
|