Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1497 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19300 Week
» 72316 Month
» 191843 Year
» 3218696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3509 |
m/e |
12/1885 |
British Railways |
30581 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
Jumbos |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 12/1885 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/03/1953 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1885 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3509 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30581 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
14/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30581 |
|
|
05/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|