Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 483 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18286 Week
» 71302 Month
» 190829 Year
» 3217682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3155 |
m/e |
03/1883 |
British Railways |
30568 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
Jumbos |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 03/1883 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/04/1958 |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1883 |
GFD |
|
Guildford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70B |
|
Feltham |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
70B |
Feltham |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
7w/e |
19/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3155 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30568 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30568 |
|
|