Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3083 |
m/e |
11/1885 |
British Railways |
30565 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
Jumbos |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 11/1885 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/02/1953 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1885 |
GFD |
|
Guildford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1885 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3083 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30565 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30565 |
|
|
11/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|