Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 389 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18192 Week
» 71208 Month
» 190735 Year
» 3217588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
471 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
British Railways |
30471 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1954 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1912 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
71D |
|
Fratton |
4w/e |
30/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/02/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 471 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30471 |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
03/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30471 |
|
|
08/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|