Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16406 Week
» 69422 Month
» 188949 Year
» 3215802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
470 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
British Railways |
30470 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/12/1952 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1912 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
13/12/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/12/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1942 |
Southern Notes |
On 19/12, the 2.20 p.m. ex Bournemouth West consisted of 14 coaches; heavily loaded, tare weight 445 tons, with 861 Lord Anson; the 28¾ miles Bournemouth Central to Southampton Central were covered in 36 minutes, a gain on schedule of 2 mins. On the same date, the Plymouth-Brighton through train left Southampton with 14 vehicles, the engines being 727 (pilot) and 470 (train). |
SLS/194302 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 470 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30470 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30470 |
|
|
01/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|