Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 95 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17898 Week
» 70914 Month
» 190441 Year
» 3217294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
464 |
m/e |
05/1912 |
British Railways |
30464 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 05/1912 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1954 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1912 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
2w/e |
20/05/1950 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
2w/e |
10/06/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
6w/e |
22/06/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 464 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30464 |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30464 |
|
|
03/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|