Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
461 |
m/e |
04/1912 |
British Railways |
30461 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
T14 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 04/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/06/1951 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1912 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 461 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30461 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30461 |
|
|