Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 640 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14046 Week
» 67062 Month
» 186589 Year
» 3213442 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
429 |
m/e |
01/1905 |
British Railways |
30429 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Bulldogs |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 01/1905 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1951 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
BM |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
TOSTORE |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 429 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30429 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30429 |
|
|
10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|