Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2539 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15945 Week
» 68961 Month
» 188488 Year
» 3215341 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
421 |
m/e |
09/1904 |
British Railways |
30421 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Bulldogs |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 09/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/09/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 421 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30421 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30421 |
|
|