Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3953 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13527 Week
» 78481 Month
» 281145 Year
» 3307998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
349 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
British Railways |
30349 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
6w/e |
09/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 349 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30349 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30349 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|