Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
313 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
British Railways |
30313 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70G |
|
|
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
72A |
|
Exmouth Junction |
4w/e |
19/08/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
70C |
Guildford |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
6w/e |
22/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
5w/e |
19/08/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 313 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30313 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
19/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30313 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|