Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3557 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22468 Week
» 87422 Month
» 290086 Year
» 3316939 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
310 |
m/e |
04/1901 |
British Railways |
30310 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 04/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/05/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 310 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30310 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30310 |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|