Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2455 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15861 Week
» 68877 Month
» 188404 Year
» 3215257 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
147 |
m/e |
04/1908 |
British Railways |
30147 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
B4 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 04/1908 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1949 |
Service Life |
40 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1908 |
SOT |
|
Southampton Docks |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
WDN |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
10/02/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
In the Docks were 'B4' tanks Nos. 81 Jersey (in steam), and 85 Alderney, 96 Normandy, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 101 Dinan, 147 Dinard, and 176 Guernsey (all out of use). No. 87 was shunting at the Terminus |
SLS/194803 |
31/08/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
At the end of August only four Class 'B.4' 0-4-OT's remained here, viz: Nos. 81 an 85 stored at the old Docks shed, and Nos. 97 an 147 stored in an old fruit warehouse near the Ocean Dock coaling stage in the old Docks. The goods shunting is monopolised by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's. The following are now lettered British Railways:-Nos. S64, S73, 30066, 30067 an 30072. Of these, No. 30072 has Gill Sans lettering and a smoke-box numberplate. Other locomotives in this area with Gill Sans lettering and smoke-box numberplates have included Nos. 30276 ('G.6'), 30567 ('0395') and 32145 ('E.1') |
SLS/194810 |
30/09/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
No. 30062 is also now painted 'British Railways,' etc., in Gill Sans style, with smokebox numberplate. Nos, 81/5 are occasionally in steam, but Nos. 97 an 147 are still out of service in the old fruit warehouse. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 147 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 30147 but not taken up |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 147 |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|