Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
94 |
m/e |
12/1892 |
British Railways |
30094 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
B4 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/03/1957 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1892 |
PLY |
|
Plymouth Friary |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/03/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
72D |
Plymouth Friary |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 94 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30094 |
|
|
09/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30094 |
|
|
04/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|