Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19243 Week
» 72259 Month
» 191786 Year
» 3218639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
83 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
British Railways |
30083 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
B4 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1959 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1947 |
Chislet Colliery |
'B4' 0-4-0 dock tank No. 83, ran light from Eastleigh via Brighton, Hastings and Ashford to Chislet Colliery, Kent, where it is at present on loan. Some of these engines will probably be withdrawn or disposed of when U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks take over more Southampton shunting duties. Class 'B.4' 0-4-OT No. 83 was seen shunting on the internal sidings at Chislet Colliery, near Canterbury, on 14/4. It is believed that this engine has been acquired from the S.R. by the Coal Board, and that it is one of a number of engines of the same class that are being sent to various collieries. It was not possible to see if the Chislet Colliery's other engines (a 0-4-0ST and a 0-6-ST) were present or not. |
SLS/194706 |
30/04/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Re-painted locomotives are now leaving Works with white or cream figures, but without any lettering. Remembrance is ex Works painted green. Two 'Atlantic's,' several Marsh 4-4-2T's and 'B4X' No. 32071 were among those noted under repair or awaiting shops on 30/4; 0-4-OT's Nos. 77S an 83 were under general repair. No. 2510 is back from the I.O.W. and the two 'Terrier's' are expected back soon; Nos. W35/6 ('0.2' Nos. 181/98) have now gone to the island. 'B.O.B.' Class: No. 34059 was loaned to the former L.N.E. Rly. early in May, for special trial runs between Liverpool St. and Norwich. |
SLS/194906 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 83 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30083 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30083 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|