31/01/1947 |
General |
New 'West Country' Class completed were 21C153-155. Fourteen of the American type 0-6-0 side tanks have been purchased and are to be numbered 61-74: the U.S.A. Nos. are 1277/84, 4326, 1952/60/66/73 (Vulcan Iron Works Nos. 4375/82/88, 4425/33/39/46/47) and 1264, 1388/96, 1402/18/19 (H. K. Porter Nos. 7420, 7502/10/16/32/33). |
SLS/194702 |
31/05/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. |
SLS/194708 |
15/11/1947 |
Southampton Docks |
On 15/11/47 the bulk of the work at Southampton Docks was being performed by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's, except for the passenger shunting which is still being carried out by the 'El' 0-6-0T's; only three 'B4's' were noted-all dead. U.S.A. 0-6-0T's in the Docks or on shed comprised:-S.R. Nos. 62-64, 66-69, 72 an 73, also U.S. No. 4326. |
SLS/194801 |
31/08/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
At the end of August only four Class 'B.4' 0-4-OT's remained here, viz: Nos. 81 an 85 stored at the old Docks shed, and Nos. 97 an 147 stored in an old fruit warehouse near the Ocean Dock coaling stage in the old Docks. The goods shunting is monopolised by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's. The following are now lettered British Railways:-Nos. S64, S73, 30066, 30067 an 30072. Of these, No. 30072 has Gill Sans lettering and a smoke-box numberplate. Other locomotives in this area with Gill Sans lettering and smoke-box numberplates have included Nos. 30276 ('G.6'), 30567 ('0395') and 32145 ('E.1') |
SLS/194810 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (Ex-Works) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |