31/01/1947 |
General |
New 'West Country' Class completed were 21C153-155. Fourteen of the American type 0-6-0 side tanks have been purchased and are to be numbered 61-74: the U.S.A. Nos. are 1277/84, 4326, 1952/60/66/73 (Vulcan Iron Works Nos. 4375/82/88, 4425/33/39/46/47) and 1264, 1388/96, 1402/18/19 (H. K. Porter Nos. 7420, 7502/10/16/32/33). |
SLS/194702 |
26/11/1961 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. |
SLS/196201 |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (awaiting scrap) |
Eastleigh shed contained the following locomotives awaiting scrap: 4656, 30033/45/65/70, 30199/225/494/502/17, 30690, 30770, 30917/26/9/37, 30955, 31892, 32346/9/50/1, 32408. |
SLS/196303 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
11/09/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) |
Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. |
SLS/196310 |