Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1141 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5956 Week
» 12090 Month
» 239974 Year
» 1461539 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41328 m/e 05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 05/1952 to Wellingborough (15A)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15A Wellingborough (New) m/e 05/1952
17B Burton w/e 14/02/1959
27C Southport w/e 31/12/1960
71A Eastleigh w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15A Wellingborough 10/05/1952
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 28/02/1959
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1960 Southport MPD Ivatt 2-6-2Ts 41277/328, stored at Buxton since Tutbury branch closure (June, 1960), are in use as station pilots displacing L & Y 2-4-2Ts, 50746/850, which have been placed in store. SLS/196103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41328
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Wellingborough (15A)
   
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41328    

prev prev