Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 113 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6089 Week
» 12223 Month
» 240107 Year
» 1461672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41277 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1950 to Rhyl (7D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7D Rhyl (New) m/e 10/1950
15A Wellingborough 4w/e 11/08/1951
17B Burton w/e 14/02/1959
27C Southport w/e 31/12/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 7D Rhyl w/e 14/10/1950
LOAN 15A Wellingborough w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 28/02/1959
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1960 Southport MPD Ivatt 2-6-2Ts 41277/328, stored at Buxton since Tutbury branch closure (June, 1960), are in use as station pilots displacing L & Y 2-4-2Ts, 50746/850, which have been placed in store. SLS/196103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41277
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Rhyl (7D)
   
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 41277    

prev prev