Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 50 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7057 Week
» 13191 Month
» 241075 Year
» 1462640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41264 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 07/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/12/1966
Scrapping During 01/1968
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1950
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/12/1950
25F Low Moor 4w/e 11/09/1954
56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/10/1958
56D Mirfield w/e 10/10/1959
56F Low Moor w/e 18/06/1960
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 09/11/1963
8M Southport w/e 20/06/1964
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/02/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 24/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 28B Fleetwood w/e 05/08/1950
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 8M Southport 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 24/12/1966
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41264
Built at Crewe Works
   
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
24/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41264    

prev prev