Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 87 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6063 Week
» 12197 Month
» 240081 Year
» 1461646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41217 on 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 25/09/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Scrapping During 09/1967
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 25/09/1948
11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 06/10/1951
9A Longsight 4w/e 04/10/1958
8D Widnes w/e 13/08/1960
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 13/01/1962
8M Southport w/e 20/06/1964
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/02/1965
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/12/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 8M Southport 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/09/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41217
Built at Crewe Works
   
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
13/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41217    

prev prev