Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 264 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3719 Week
» 15012 Month
» 279645 Year
» 1501210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6931 m/e 06/1902
BR 46931 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1902
Withdrawal During 03/1949 off Monument Lane (3E)
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1902
3B Bushbury on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane w/e 03/07/1948
WDN   w/e 05/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1902 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6931
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46931 but not taken up    
03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6931 from Monument Lane (3E)    

prev