Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 262 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3717 Week
» 15010 Month
» 279643 Year
» 1501208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6926 m/e 03/1902
BR 46926 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal Sat 14/02/1948
Scrapping During 04/1948
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1902
7B Bangor on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7B Bangor m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 7B Bangor 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 28/06/1947
WDN 7B Bangor w/e 14/02/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6926
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
14/02/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 6926    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46926 but not taken up    

prev prev