Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 96 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4733 Week
» 16026 Month
» 280659 Year
» 1502224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6924 m/e 03/1902
BR 46924 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal During 12/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1950
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1902
8B Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 05/07/1947
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane w/e 01/05/1948
WDN   w/e 03/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6924
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46924 but not taken up    
12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6924    

prev prev