Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 87 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4724 Week
» 16017 Month
» 280650 Year
» 1502215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6917 m/e 05/1901
BR 46917 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/04/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 48 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1901
8A Edge Hill on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 05/06/1948
WDN   w/e 30/04/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1901 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6917
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A)    
30/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6917    
31/10/1952 Number Allocated Allocated number 46917 but not taken up    

prev prev