Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 56 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4693 Week
» 15986 Month
» 280619 Year
» 1502184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6906 m/e 08/1900
BR 46906 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal During 05/1951
Scrapping During 05/1951
Service Life 50 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1900
8B Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/07/1947
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane w/e 24/09/1949
LOAN 7B Bangor w/e 11/03/1950
WDN   w/e 19/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Longsight MPD Strangers noted during January were 5253 (7A) with 20 empty coaches; 6111 (8A) (whilst 8A Patriots and Jubilees work regularly, its Scots are rarely seen there) and 6906 (8D). It may be noted that whilst Warrington 0-6-2T shunt daily at Longsight after working passenger trains to London Road (South Junction), 8D locos are uncommon. SLS/194604
30/09/1948 North Wales Bangor shed received on 6/9 two new Class '2P' 2-6-2T's, Nos. 41212 an 41213 . Both are in the new black livery, lined out in red, straw and grey, the numbers being on the tank sides below the cab window and not on the coal bunker as on the earlier examples of the Class. Both locomotives are fitted for 'push and pull' working, and are to work on the Amlwch and Bethseda branches. No. 41213 made her first trip on the Amlwch branch on 9/9 when she worked the 3.55 p.m. from Bangor. In spite of spending nearly ten minutes at Llangefni disposing of a loaded cattle truck and a large number of parcels and luggage, the arrival at Amlwch was only 6 minutes late. A small crowd of interested railwaymen and others witnessed her departure from Bangor. Until the arrival of these two new 2-6-2T's, traffic on the Amlwch branch has been shared between 2-6-2T No. 1200 and Webb 2-4-2T No. 46687. The latter, although so aged, puts up a good performance on the branch and was noted touching 60 m.p.h. between Gaerwen and Menai Bridge when working the 10.45 a.m. from Amlwch on 9/9. The thrice-weekly goods train on the Holland Arms-Red Wharf Bay branch is worked by either 'Cauliflower' No. 28553 or one of the two tank versions of the Class stationed at Bangor-Nos. 6899 an 6906. Trains from Bangor to Afon Wen are shortly to be worked through to Pwllheli by ex L.M.S. engines and on this account most of the 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor for this duty are to be transferred else-where, since they are not suitable for working over the old Cambrian section of the former G.W.R. They are to be replaced by Stanier 2-6-2T's which will augment the few already there which include Nos. 72 an 124. 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor include Nos. 2258, 2259, 2260, 2261 an 2628. Bangor's rapidly dwindling band of Webb 'coal tanks' include Nos. 7730, 7765 an 7822. Three ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's, Nos. 12119, 12176 an 12407, are also at Bangor for short distance goods haulage. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6906
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46906 but not taken up    
05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 6906    

prev prev