Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 301 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3756 Week
» 15049 Month
» 279682 Year
» 1501247 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6900 m/e 08/1900
BR 46900 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/02/1953
Scrapping During 03/1953
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1900
8A Edge Hill on 01/01/1948
3E Monument Lane 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 28/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 05/07/1947
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane w/e 27/11/1948
WDN   w/e 28/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1900 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6900
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 46900    
28/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 46900    

prev prev