Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 258 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3713 Week
» 15006 Month
» 279639 Year
» 1501204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6876 m/e 09/1898
BR 46876 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 18" Passenger Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1898
Withdrawal During 08/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 50 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1898
5C Stafford on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane w/e 07/02/1948
WDN   w/e 06/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/06/1947 Crewe Works Further Class 5 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4773 (5/5), 4774 (10/5), 4775 (17/5), 4776 (24/5), 4777 (31/5) and 4778 (9/6). These are all receiving lettering, etc., in the new style. The latest 4-6-2 to have the streamline casing removed is No. 6247 , she was ex the Erecting Shop on 4/6 and No. 6240 will be dealt with next. No. 6115 is the next 'Scot' to be rebuilt, while the next 'Patriots' to be converted are Nos. 5529 and 5528 (in that order), the former will probably be in traffic early in July. No. 4829 is being fitted for oil-burning and the 2-8-0's so fitted include Nos. 8191, 8273, and 8696. Since the end of April the following locos. have been withdrawn: Nos. 6619, 6653, 6723, 6728, 6876, 6894, 6927, 6930, 7682, 7709, 28262, 28278, 28422, 28524, 28589, 28614. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1898 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6876
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46876 but not taken up    
08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6876    

prev