Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 556 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8010 Week
» 10592 Month
» 275225 Year
» 1496790 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27799 y/e c. 0
BR 58926 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1888
Withdrawal Fri 31/10/1958
Service Life 70 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1888
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/09/1950
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 22/05/1954
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/10/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 31/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/10/1955
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   m/e 31/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1958
Current Status Under Restoration/Overhaul
Information Undergoing heavy overhaul at Ingrow Workshops
Link www.kwvr.co.uk/
Status Date 22/03/2011


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1958 Pontypool Road MPD The stationary boiler here is to undergo repairs and the last Webb locomotive, ex-L.N.W.R. ' Coal ' tank 58926, is to be used for this purpose for about two months. SLS/195805
17/05/1958 Webb Coal Tank Webb Coal Tank 58926 has been recommended for preservation-however, both 58427 (Cauliflower 0-6-0) and 0-6-0ST Earlestown were similarly recommended but were finally scrapped after a long delay. SLS/195806
17/05/1958 Pontypool Road MPD 58926 is now stored outside (with 49113). SLS/195807
20/05/1958 Last train on the Abergavenny - Merthyr line Cine-film shots of the train will be featured in the new B.B.C. series 'Railway Roundabout' in Children's Television on Tuesday, 20th May. In mid-May, Messrs. Transacord are issuing their record 5036/7 labelled ' London North Western 0-8-0;' 12 minutes of side 5037 reproduces the S.L.S. special train leaving Govilon with 0-8-0 49121 and Webb Coal Tank 58926, also at Rhymney Bridge and near Beaufort and on the return journey at Rhymney Bridge. The record is 33 r.p.m. and is (22/6) SLS/195805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27799    
01/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58926    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 58926